Board changes and delisting
2007年9月7日 - 1:13AM
RNSを含む英国規制内ニュース (英語)
RNS Number:4435D
Poole Investments PLC
06 September 2007
Poole Investments plc (the "Company")
6 September 2007
Board changes and delisting
The offer made by Inland plc for the entire issued and to be issued ordinary
share capital of the Company on 9 August 2007 has now become unconditional in
all respects. Accordingly, as agreed, Tony Palmer (Non-Executive Chairman),
David Booth (Executive Director) and David Cicurel (Non-Executive Director) have
now all resigned from the Company with effect from 6 September 2007.
Nishith Malde and Paul Brett have both been appointed as Executive Directors of
the Company with effect from 6 September 2007.
The Company will apply to the London Stock Exchange for the cancellation of the
admission of ordinary shares of 5p each to trading on the AIM market. It is
anticipated that such cancellation will take effect no earlier than 20 business
days from today's date and it is currently anticipated that cancellation will
take place at 8.00am on Monday 8 October 2007.
This announcement should be read in conjunction with the Offer Document dated 9
August 2007 and the announcement made on 13 August 2007 that the Offer had been
converted to a mandatory offer. Terms used in this announcement shall have the
meaning given to them in the Offer Document.
Note:
The details to be disclosed under Schedule 2(g) of the AIM Rules are as follows:
Full name: Nishith Motilal Meghji Mulji Malde
Date of Birth: 3 June 1958
Current Directorships:
Highlands Village Limited
SLR Holdings Limited
Prime Assets Ltd
Howarth Homes plc
Billam plc
World Life Sciences Limited
Urco Limited
Inland plc
Inland Homes Limited
EiRx Pharma Limited
Development Funding Limited
Double Helix Partnership
Carina Capital Limited
Previous Directorships:
Country and Metropolitan Limited
Belhouse Limited
Country & Metropolitan
Homes (Northern) Limited
Gladedale (Surrey) Limited
Country & Metropolitan Homes (East Midlands) Limited
St. James Village Limited
Bredero Homes Limited
Country & Metropolitan Homes (Earlswood) Limited
Country & Metropolitan Homes (Highlands) Limited
Country & Metropolitan Homes (Hitchin) Limited
Straytime Limited
Bestshield Properties Limited
Storey Homes (Lancaster) Limited
Country & Metropolitan Homes (Manchester) Limited
Burnside Mill Developments Limited
Broseley Homes Limited
Spacex (C&M) Limited
Country & Metropolitan Homes (Woking) Limited
Kiddies Care Limited
New Hartley Developments Limited
High Royds Limited
Gladedale (South Yorkshire) Limited
Gladedale (Lincoln) Limited
Gladedale (Lancashire) Limited
Gladedale (East Midlands) Limited
Gladedale (Home Counties) Limited
Gladedale (Developments) Limited
Gladedale (South West) Limited
Gladedale (Stockton) Limited
Gladedale (Leeds) Limited
Gladedale (Central) Limited
Reland (Rissington) Limited
Gladedale (Southern) Limited
Homestart Barnet
Farnborough Land Limited
There are no other matters to be disclosed under Schedule 2(g).
Full Name: Paul Brett
Date of Birth: 8 October 1976
Current directorships:
Inland Homes Limited
Fulmer Developments Limited
Fulmer Estates Limited
Previous Directorships:
Country & Metropolitan Homes Limited
There are no other matters to be disclosed under Schedule 2(g).
For more information, please contact:
Zeus Capital 0161 831 1512
Nick Cowles/Kevin Wilson
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAILFLRALIRIID
Poole Investments (LSE:PIV)
過去 株価チャート
から 9 2024 まで 10 2024
Poole Investments (LSE:PIV)
過去 株価チャート
から 10 2023 まで 10 2024
Real-Time news about Poole Invest. (ロンドン証券取引所): 0 recent articles
その他のPoole Investmentsニュース記事