Directorate Change
2008年4月2日 - 4:02PM
RNSを含む英国規制内ニュース (英語)
RNS Number:3816R
GMO Limited
02 April 2008
Press Release 2 April 2008
GMO Limited
("GMO" or the "Group")
Directorate Change
GMO Limited (AIM:GMO), an AIM-listed leading provider of wireless value-added
services ('WVAS') currently focused on the Chinese market announces the
resignation of Mr Eddie Yap Yuh Foh as non-executive director with effect from
31 March 2008.
For further information:
GMO Limited
Eugene Goh, Chief Executive Officer Tel: + 65 9690 0099
eugene@gmoglobal.com www.gmoglobal.com
Blue Oar Securities
Justin Lewis Tel: +61 (0) 3 8637 1540
jlewis@blueoarsecurities.co.uk
John Wakefield Tel: +44 (0) 117 933 0020
jwakefield@blueoarsecurities.co.uk www.blueoarsecurities.co.uk
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAEAKLAELXPEEE
Gmo (LSE:GMO)
過去 株価チャート
から 8 2024 まで 9 2024
Gmo (LSE:GMO)
過去 株価チャート
から 9 2023 まで 9 2024
Real-Time news about Gmo (ロンドン証券取引所): 0 recent articles
その他のGmo Limitedニュース記事